FL H3513 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from General Revenue Fund to compensate parents for loss of their son, Devaughn Darling, whose death occurred while he was engaged in football preseason training on Florida State University campus; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Wendy Smith, Dennis Darling, Sr./State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0016 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/3513 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/3513/BillText/Filed/PDF |