FL H3587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 60A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 60A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Training Facility for People Who are Blind and Visually Impaired in Pasco County.
Title
Training Facility for People Who are Blind and Visually Impaired in Pasco County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 60A) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 60A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3587 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3587/BillText/Filed/PDF |