FL H3941 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida FIRST Robotics Team Grant at UCF.
Title
Florida FIRST Robotics Team Grant at UCF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 141) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3941 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3941/BillText/Filed/PDF |