FL H4047 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to judicial census commissions.
Title
Judicial Census Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#753 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#753 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1179 | |
2012-03-07 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 914 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Budget -SJ 914 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Judiciary; Budget -SJ 832 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 832 | |
2012-02-16 | In Messages | |
2012-02-15 | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 617 | |
2012-02-15 | Read 3rd time -HJ 617 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 596 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/12 | |
2012-01-19 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 239 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 239 | |
2012-01-17 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/19/12, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 149 | |
2011-10-18 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 171 | |
2011-10-18 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 171 | |
2011-10-11 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 10/18/11, 1:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-10-03 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 149 | |
2011-09-22 | Filed |