FL H4061 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to required adoption by Financial Services Commission of uniform home grading scale to grade ability of home to withstand wind load from tropical storms or hurricanes.
Title
Uniform Home Grading Scale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#68 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#682 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#682 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1716 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1 -SJ 1248 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1248 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 832 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 832 | |
2012-02-08 | In Messages | |
2012-02-03 | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 -HJ 477 | |
2012-02-03 | Read 3rd time -HJ 476 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 442 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/12 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 149 | |
2011-11-15 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 173 | |
2011-11-15 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 -HJ 173 | |
2011-11-08 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 11/15/11, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-11-03 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 172 | |
2011-11-02 | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 172 | |
2011-10-26 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 11/02/11, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-10-17 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 150 | |
2011-10-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5586 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 55865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |