FL H5103 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-25, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-25, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for carryforward of any unexpended balance of appropriation for Ed & Ethel Moore Alzheimer's Disease Research Program.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease Research
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#540 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#540 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Chapter No. 2016-25, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66) | |
2016-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-02-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Substituted for SB 2510 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-11 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-11 | House | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2016-02-11 | House | Immediately certified |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-03 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/03/16, 9:30 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-29 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0941 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-230, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S2510 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25), CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66)
H5001 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Chapter No. 2016-66, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S2500 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S0918 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2016-125), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S2510 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25), CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66)
H5001 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Chapter No. 2016-66, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S2500 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S0918 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), CS/HB 375 (Ch. 2016-125), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)