FL H6001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SJR 1176 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SJR 1176 (Passed)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for apportionment of House of Representatives & Senate (plans _______ and S000S9008); adopts U.S. Decennial Census of 2010 for use in such apportionment; provides for inclusion of omitted areas; provides contiguity for areas specified for inclusion in one district which are noncontiguous; specifies that apportioned districts constitute legislative districts of state; provides for severability of invalid portions; provides for application beginning in 2012.
Title
Joint Resolution of Apportionment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SJR 1176 (Passed) | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 309 | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Redistricting Committee read 1st time -HJ 295 | |
2012-01-27 | CS by- Redistricting Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 7 -HJ 301 | |
2012-01-24 | On Committee agenda-- Redistricting Committee, 01/27/12, 9:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-18 | On Committee agenda-- Redistricting Committee, 01/20/12, 9:00 am, 404 HOB --Workshopped | |
2012-01-13 | Referred to Redistricting Committee -HJ 226 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 156 | |
2012-01-10 | Filed |