FL H6017 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4 (Ch. 2023-321)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4 (Ch. 2023-321)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation to Maria Garcia as compensation for injuries resulting from negligence of employee of Pinellas County School Board; provides legislative intent regarding waiver of certain liens; provides limitation on compensation & payment of attorney fees.
Title
Relief/Maria Garcia/Pinellas County School Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4 (Ch. 2023-321) |
2023-04-28 | House | Substituted SB 4 |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-03-20 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S4 (Same As) 2023-07-10 - Chapter No. 2023-321