FL H6037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to limitation of size of individual wine containers.
Title
Individual Wine Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-04-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 3 |
2019-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19 |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/14/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-06 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:15 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S220 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S894 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H907 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1219 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S894 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H907 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1219 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology