FL H6053 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 904
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 904
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of certain provisions regulating use of containers in exit access corridors.
Title
Doorstep Waste Containers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 904 |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S904 (Same As) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-130