FL H6059 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abrogates scheduled repeal of provisions governing DSO that is permitted to use facilities of state correctional system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Corrections' Direct-Support Organization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#608 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-143
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for SB 938
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-25HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-16HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-12-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S938 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6059
S864 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944802Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback