FL H6067 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions requiring counties & municipalities to provide incentives to fully offset costs of certain affordable housing contributions or linkage fees.
Title
Repeal of Developer Incentive Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 01055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 04151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6067 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6067/BillText/Filed/PDF |