FL H6067 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises institutions student must attend to receive William L. Boyd, IV, Effective Access to Student Education grant to include certain for-profit independent colleges & universities.
Title
William L. Boyd, IV, Effective Access to Student Education Grant Program
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Mike Caruso [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-08 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-10-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1034 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education