FL H7021 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises written notice requirements relating to filing petitions for involuntary services; revises requirements relating to voluntary admissions to facility for examination & treatment, ordering person for involuntary services & treatment, petitions for involuntary service, appointment of counsel, & continuances of hearings; revises actions that constitute unlawful activities relating to assessment & treatment & court actions relating to involuntary assessments.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#987 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#792 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#792 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2024-03-08 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-08 | House | Amendment 271428 Concur |
2024-03-08 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2024-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-08 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (271428) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1784 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Amendment 238169 adopted as amended |
2024-03-01 | House | Amendment 473603 adopted |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) |
2024-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-19 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-19 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1784 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 7021
S1626 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H915 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H951 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
H7023 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S1306 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S7016 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-15
S1626 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H915 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H951 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
H7023 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S1306 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S7016 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-15
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 468 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 499 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 90826 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 581 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 68111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 68112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 68141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 68151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 693 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 2007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |