FL H7023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain funds to be expended on Individual Training Accounts; revises items that qualify as account expenditures; amends & reenacts provisions relating to restrictions on use of state & federal funds provided to regional workforce boards & contracts between regional workforce boards & members of regional workforce boards; provides for maximum board membership; provides additional membership requirements; authorizes Governor to remove board members for cause; requires DEO to assign staff for performance & compliance review; requires each board to develop budget for certain purposes, subject to approval of chief elected official, & submit budget to Workforce Florida, Inc.; requires Workforce Florida, Inc., to evaluate means to establish single, statewide workforce-system brand for state; deletes expiration of provision providing that participants in adult or youth work experience activities are employees of state for purposes of workers' compensation coverage.
Title
Regional Workforce Boards
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Brodeur [R] | House Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | Rep. Chris Dorworth [R] | House Economic Affairs Committee |
Rep. Doug Holder [R] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] | Rep. Stephen Precourt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#679 (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#679 (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1245 | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 1005 | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1005 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 863 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 863 | |
2012-02-08 | In Messages | |
2012-02-03 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 95 NAYS 19 -HJ 475 | |
2012-02-03 | Read 3rd time -HJ 475 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 440 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/12 | |
2012-01-19 | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 235 | |
2012-01-19 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 236 | |
2012-01-18 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-12 | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6 -HJ 237 | |
2012-01-10 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 01/12/12, 11:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 159 | |
2011-12-29 | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 159 | |
2011-12-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
445 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |