FL H7037 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the term "community association management"; providing powers and duties of community association managers and community association management firms; requiring a release of lien to be in a specific form; deleting a provision providing for the expiration of certain liens; providing requirements for the execution of a claim of lien, etc.
Title
Residential Communities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#728 (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#682 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#681 (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#683 (Y: 39 N: 75 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#728 (Y: 97 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#682 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#681 (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#683 (Y: 39 N: 75 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-146 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1466 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 97 NAYS 15 |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (897265) |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (346035, 831299) |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-04 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 |
2014-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/04/14, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-13 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 03/04/14, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1466 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7037 (Ch. 2014-146)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 431 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 4334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |