FL H7063 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the amount of a fee that a clerk of court may be required to collect with each civil traffic penalty; providing for the issuance of identification cards at no charge to certain persons in the custody or under the supervision of the Department of Juvenile Justice; providing exceptions to a requirement that a person obtain a replacement driver license reflecting a change of name within a specified time period; requiring the department to maintain an integrated website link to the organ and tissue donor registry, etc.
Title
Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee | Sen. Greg Steube [R] | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239) |
2016-02-03 | House | Temporarily postponed on 3rd reading; On Unfinished Business |
2016-02-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (797873) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16 |
2016-01-28 | House | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-28 | House | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 01/28/16, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2016-01-19 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1394 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 231 (Ch. 2016-77), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
S1066 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
H7061 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-239, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/SB 1508 (Ch. 2016-209)
S1066 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
H7061 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-239, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/SB 1508 (Ch. 2016-209)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 1215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |