FL H7065 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Chapter No. 2022-67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Chapter No. 2022-67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families and Department of Juvenile Justice to identify and meet the needs of dually-involved children within a specified timeframe; revising information that must be included in a transition plan; requiring prenatal and infant health care delivery programs to include certain father engagement activities; requiring the Department of Children and Families to contract for the development and implementation of the Responsible Fatherhood Initiative and to provide grants to community-based not-for-profit organizations to offer certain mentorship programs; designating the month of June as "Responsible Fatherhood Month", etc.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#526 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#526 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Chapter No. 2022-67 | |
2022-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Amendment 063139 adopted |
2022-02-16 | House | Amendment 638065 Failed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2022) |
2022-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1577 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-65
S858 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1577
S1894 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S7034 (Similar To) 2022-04-12 - Chapter No. 2022-68
S858 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1577
S1894 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S7034 (Similar To) 2022-04-12 - Chapter No. 2022-68
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2564 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 25996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 997 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
683 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |