FL H7077 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to Commission on Interstate Cooperation, Senate Committee on Interstate Cooperation, House of Representatives Committee on Interstate Cooperation, Joint Legislative Committee on Interstate Cooperation, Governor's Committee on Interstate Cooperation, etc.
Title
Legislative Advisory Bodies
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Galvano [R] | Rep. Mike Horner [R] | Rep. Seth McKeel [R] | Rep. Peter Nehr [R] |
Rep. Marlene O'Toole [R] | Rep. Lake Ray [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0577 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) | |
2010-03-23 | In Messages | |
2010-03-18 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00316; Passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 00316 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00283; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00283 | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 00225 | |
2010-03-04 | Filed; Introduced -HJ 00214 |
Same As/Similar To
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H5709 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H5709 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2010-152), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 249 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 994 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0013 | 996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0014 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0590 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |