FL H7077 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 994 (Ch. 2013-18)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 994 (Ch. 2013-18)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conforms provisions to the directive of the Legislature in s. 9, of ch. 2012-116, LOF, to prepare a reviser's bill to omit all statutes and laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 994 (Ch. 2013-18) |
2013-03-21 | House | Substituted SB 994 |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/13 |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-03-11 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0994 (Same As) 2013-04-11 - Chapter No. 2013-18
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 765 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 358 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
119 | 0712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
199 | 1851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
207 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
207 | 0281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 1231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
238 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 0165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 0747 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 0005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0666 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
391 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
391 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 0641 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 998 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 176 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 14511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2576 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2578 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 1585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 1105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 2255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
496 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
548 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 897 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
563 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
578 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
582 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 793 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 289 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
658 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
663 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
668 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 785 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 7021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
865 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0543 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
949 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
984 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7077 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/7077/BillText/Filed/PDF |