FL H7095 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - In returning messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - In returning messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Makes failure to comply with requirements of s. 456.44, F.S., grounds for disciplinary action; provides mandatory administrative penalties for certain violations related to prescribing; requires prescriptions for controlled substances to be written on counterfeit-resistant pad produced by approved vendor or electronically prescribed; provides conditions for being approved vendor; requires certain physicians to designate themselves as controlled substance prescribing practitioners on their practitioner profiles, etc. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Prescription Drugs
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Health and Human Services Committee | House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Robert Schenck [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#276 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 1093 | |
2011-04-27 | Received -SJ 544 | |
2011-04-26 | In Messages | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time -HJ 749 | |
2011-04-20 | Read 2nd time -HJ 706 | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/20/11 | |
2011-04-14 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-12 | CS/CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 -HJ 645 | |
2011-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/12/11, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-04-05 | CS referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 414 | |
2011-04-04 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-30 | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 415 | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/30/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Judiciary Committee -HJ 311 | |
2011-03-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 327 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 0121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
499 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |