FL H7095 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for proprietary business information provided to corporation's policyholder eligibility clearinghouse program by insurers with respect to identifying & selecting risks for offer of coverage; defines term "proprietary business information"; authorizes disclosure under specified conditions; provides for future review & repeal of exemption under OGSR Act; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Clearinghouse Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#323 (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61), CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60) |
2013-05-01 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (088215, 221143, 714385) |
2013-04-26 | House | Was taken up |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable by- Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7093 (Related) 2013-04-29 - CS failed to pass; YEAS 51 NAYS 65, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1850 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-61, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
H0909 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1606 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1622 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1770 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-60, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1850 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-61, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60)
H0909 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1606 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1622 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1770 (Ch. 2013-60), SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)
S1770 (Similar To) 2013-05-29 - Chapter No. 2013-60, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1850 (Ch. 2013-61)