FL H7095 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from public records requirements personal identifying information of patients, caregivers, & physicians held by DOH in medical marijuana use registry & information related to physician's certification for marijuana & dispensing thereof; authorizes specified persons & entities access to exempt information; requires that information released from registry remain confidential & exempt; provides criminal penalty; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Medical Marijuana Use Registry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#457 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#384 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#384 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in House |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-05 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-05 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (582042) |
2017-05-05 | House | Refused to concur in 2 amendment(s) (315110, 450998) |
2017-05-04 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (315110, 450998, 582042) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1844 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-05-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-05-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 1 1045 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-04-06 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable by Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Government Accountability Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1397 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Died in House
S1388 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1666 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1758 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1844 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table
S1388 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1666 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1758 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1844 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table