FL H8003 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Joint Legislative Task Force on Turkish and Florida Relations.
Title
Joint Legislative Task Force on Turkish and Florida Relations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Rules and Calendar Committee |
2013-12-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/8003 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/8003/BillText/Filed/PDF |