FL S0010 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter No. 2017-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter No. 2017-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the South Florida Water Management District and the Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund to negotiate the amendment and termination of leases on lands within the Everglades Agricultural Area for exchange or use for the reservoir project; requiring certain lease agreements for agricultural work programs to be terminated in accordance with the lease terms; requiring the district to request that the United States Army Corps of Engineers jointly develop a post-authorization change report for the Central Everglades Planning Project; providing requirements
Title
Water Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#396 (Y: 99 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#395 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#396 (Y: 99 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#395 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Chapter No. 2017-10 | |
2017-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-04 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2017-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (061749) 626 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | In returning messages |
2017-05-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 99 NAYS 19 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time 1069 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (061749) |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Received |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-04-12 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (163704, 921088) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) failed (232260, 264380, 376758, 616632, 623444, 948278) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 03/08/17, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/07/17, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0761 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
H1357 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
S1686 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
H1357 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
S1686 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
201 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 4598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 890 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |