FL S0016 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Barney Brown, who was wrongfully incarcerated for 38 years; providing an appropriation to compensate Barney Brown for his wrongful incarceration; directing the Chief Financial Officer to draw a warrant; providing that the act does not waive certain defenses or increase the state's liability; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Barney Brown by the State of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0737 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - Filed in error, see HB 3503
H3503 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H3503 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/16 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0016/BillText/Filed/HTML |