FL S0054 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising an eligibility criterion under which a person is eligible to petition a court to expunge a criminal history record if an indictment, information, or other charging document was dismissed by a court; expanding an exception to an eligibility requirement for expunction of a criminal history record to allow a prior expunction of a criminal history record granted for an offense committed when the person was a minor, etc.
Title
Expunction of Criminal History Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 12/05/23, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-09-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H97 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee