FL S0062 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Amie Draiemann Stephenson, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Christian Darby Stephenson, deceased, and for the relief of Hailey Morgan Stephenson and Christian Darby Stephenson, II, as surviving minor children of the decedent; providing an appropriation to compensate them for the wrongful death of Christian Darby Stephenson, which was due in part to the negligence of the Department of Transportation; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief/Amie Draiemann Stephenson, Hailey Morgan Stephenson, and Christian Darby Stephenson, II/Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 15 | |
2011-09-08 | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills -SJ 15 | |
2011-08-01 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/62 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0062/BillText/Filed/HTML |