FL S0062 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the relief of Robert Champion, Sr., and Pam Champion by Florida Agricultural and Mechanical University; providing an appropriation to compensate Robert Champion, Sr., and Pam Champion, individually and as personal representatives for the Estate of Robert Champion, Jr., for the wrongful death of their son, Robert Champion, Jr., which was due to the negligence of Florida A & M University; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs; providing that the appropriation settles all present and future claims related to the wrongful death of Robert Champion, Jr., etc.
Title
Relief of Robert Champion, Sr., and Pam Champion by Florida A & M University
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/62 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0062/BillText/Filed/HTML |