FL S0062 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a requirement for the Executive Office of the Governor to review and consider certain reports, data, and analyses relating to the revision of the state comprehensive plan; eliminating the advisory role of regional planning councils in state comprehensive plan preparation and revision; repealing provisions relating to the Florida Regional Planning Council Act; authorizing local governments to recommend areas of critical state concern to the state land planning agency, etc.
Title
Regional Planning Councils
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/26/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1013 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 372 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3178 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
164 | 1031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
186 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
187 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 559 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
260 | 0142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
335 | 188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 2278 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
378 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 0752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 50663 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 5115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 526 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 5272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 5363 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 5365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7226 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 723 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 9403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 941 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 9422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
427 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |