FL S0066 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3521 (Ch. 2015-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3521 (Ch. 2015-211)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Ronald Miller by the City of Hollywood; providing for an appropriation to compensate him for injuries sustained as a result of the negligence of an employee of the City of Hollywood; providing a limitation on the payment of fees and costs, etc.
Title
Relief of Ronald Miller by the City of Hollywood
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 3521 (Ch. 2015-211) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 3521 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/15, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/24/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Special Master on Claim Bills |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H3521 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-211