FL S0088 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Chapter No. 2016-182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Including certain individuals as qualified for issuance of a Gold Star license plate, etc.
Title
Gold Star License Plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#836 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Chapter No. 2016-182 | |
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Substituted for HB 435 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Received |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16 |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-01-21 | House | In Messages |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/13/16 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 12/03/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/04/15, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Fiscal Policy |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0435 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 88 (Ch. 2016-182)