FL S0104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Prescription Drug Donation Repository Program Act"; creating the program within the Department of Health; authorizing the department to contract with a third-party vendor to administer the program; providing inspection, inventory, and storage requirements for centralized and local repositories; authorizing the department to establish a direct-support organization to provide assistance, funding, and promotional support for program activities; authorizing the Governor to waive program patient eligibility requirements during a declared state of emergency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Donation Repository Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-02-20SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/20/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-04SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-12-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-11-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H59 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651902Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback