FL S0136 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Save Our Teachers Act"; increasing the minimum base salary for full-time classroom teachers and certain prekindergarten teachers, etc.
Title
Minimum Base Salary for Full-time Classroom Teachers
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations |
2023-10-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H13 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/136 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/136/BillText/Filed/HTML |