FL S0170 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Legal Affairs from entering into certain contracts until the Attorney General makes a specified written determination; requiring the Attorney General to request proposals from private attorneys after making such determination; providing that the written determination does not constitute a final agency action that is subject to review; providing that the request for proposals and the contract award are not subject to challenge under the Administrative Procedure Act, etc.
Title
Legal Representation Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 0156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/170 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/170/BillText/Filed/HTML |