FL S0214 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for reclassification of specified offenses committed against brokers, broker associates, or sales associates, etc.
Title
Offenses Against Brokers, Broker Associates, or Sales Associates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2016-02-23 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/22/16, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0047 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar