FL S0222 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting from the definition of "public utility" property owners who own and operate a renewable energy source device, produce renewable energy from that device, and provide or sell the renewable energy to users on that property, under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Property Rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-01-03SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
290007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
350111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7681382Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
815061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93403Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback