FL S0232 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to increase the percentage of elector votes required to approve an amendment or a revision to the State Constitution from 60 percent to 66 and 2/3 percent, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Percentage of Elector Votes Required to Approve an Amendment or a Revision

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-20SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-03-20SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
2019-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H57 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback