FL S0280 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from public records requirements information from the screenings for participation in a treatment-based drug court program, substance abuse screenings, behavioral health evaluations, and subsequent treatment status reports regarding a participant or a person considered for participation in a treatment-based program; providing for exceptions to the exemption; providing for retroactive application of the public record exemption; providing for future repeal and legislative review of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Participants in Treatment-based Drug Court Programs
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#799 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-174 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 109 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Received |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-24 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/14 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/14, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/14/14, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0109 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 280 (Ch. 2014-174)