FL S0292 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies laws and rules to be enforced by the Department of Health. Provides that an operator of a mobile home park, lodging park, recreational vehicle park, or recreational camp who refuses to pay the operating permit fee required by law or who fails, neglects, or refuses to obtain an operating permit for the park commits a misdemeanor of the second degree. Provides a penalty for failure to depart from a park under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Mobile Home and Recreational Vehicle Parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-26 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 475 | |
2011-04-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-12 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-11 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-06 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/11/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-30 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 299 | |
2011-03-29 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Health Regulation (664890); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 299 | |
2011-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/28/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 31 | |
2011-02-08 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 117 | |
2011-02-07 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 117 | |
2011-01-28 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/07/11, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Transportation; Health Regulation; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 31 | |
2010-12-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0847 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
513 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
513 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |