FL S0292 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from the definition of "public utility" property owners who own and operate a renewable energy source device and who produce renewable energy from that device and provide and sell such renewable energy to users on that property, under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Private Property Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/292 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/292/BillText/Filed/HTML |