FL S0298 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the governing bodies of certain municipalities to hold meetings within specified boundaries.
Title
Municipal Governing Body Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#502 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 851 | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1118 | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1063 | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1007 | |
2011-03-23 | In Messages | |
2011-03-16 | Read 3rd time -SJ 232 | |
2011-03-15 | Read 2nd time -SJ 223 | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 31 | |
2011-02-10 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 117 | |
2011-01-31 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 02/10/11, 8:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-01-27 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 108 | |
2011-01-25 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 117 | |
2011-01-14 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/25/11, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-01-05 | Referred to Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 31 | |
2010-12-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0065 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 298 (Ch.