FL S0298 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who publishes or disseminates an arrest booking photograph through a publicly accessible print or electronic medium from soliciting or accepting payment of a fee or other consideration to remove, correct, or modify such photograph; authorizing an action to enjoin publication or dissemination of an arrest booking photograph if the publisher or disseminator unlawfully solicits or accepts a fee or other consideration to remove, correct, or modify such photograph; specifying the time period during which an arrest booking photograph must be removed pursuant to court order; providing a civil penalty, etc.
Title
Arrest Booking Photographs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/10/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/03/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2013-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0265 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
836 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |