FL S0298 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to provide coastal counties, beginning on a specified date, with Resilient Florida Grant Program grants to fund saltwater intrusion vulnerability assessments; requiring the department to update the comprehensive statewide flood vulnerability and sea level rise data set and make certain information received from the saltwater intrusion vulnerability assessments publicly available on its website; requiring the department to provide cost-share funding up to a specified amount for awarded grants, etc.
Title
Saltwater Intrusion Vulnerability Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Messages |
2024-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (869936) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/18/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 12/06/23, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1079 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee