FL S0310 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing a provision that prohibits parents of an adult child from recovering certain damages in medical negligence suits, etc.
Title
Recovery of Damages in Claims for Medical Negligence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H77 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H129 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S248 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S442 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
H129 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S248 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S442 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/310 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/310/BillText/Filed/HTML |