FL S0314 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions relating to the involuntary mandatory waiver of children by a state attorney; requiring a state attorney to document in writing specified information; requiring the state attorney to submit specified collected information to the Department of Juvenile Justice; deleting provisions relating to the mandatory direct filing of children to adult court, etc.
Title
Direct Filing of Juveniles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78) |
2016-03-11 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (865416) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/02/15, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0129 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78)
S0282 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
H0293 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-78
H0239 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0558 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78)
S0700 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78)
S0282 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
H0293 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-78
H0239 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0558 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78)
S0700 (Similar To) 2016-03-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2016-78)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |