FL S0340 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Jim King Keep Florida Working Act." Authorizes a court to seal a criminal history record of a person who had a prior criminal history record sealed or expunged in certain circumstances.
Title
Sealing Criminal History Records [GPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennett [R] | Sen. Anthony Hill [D] | Sen. Alfred Lawson [D] | Sen. Gary Siplin [D] |
Sen. Christopher Smith [D] | Sen. Frederica Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0025 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-27 | In Messages | |
2010-04-27 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00920; Amendment(s) adopted (289108) -SJ 00920; Passed as amended (289108); YEAS 36 NAYS 1 -SJ 00920 | |
2010-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00843; Amendment(s) adopted (807390, 211172) -SJ 00843; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00847 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00702 | |
2010-04-20 | Favorable by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 00702 | |
2010-04-15 | On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/20/10, 2:15 pm, 412-K | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00551; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00551 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, 110-S | |
2010-03-05 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-04 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00032; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/10, 10:30 am, 110-S; Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00162; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2010-02-02 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0; Now in Criminal Justice | |
2010-01-25 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/10, 10:30 am, 110-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-10-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0961 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
H0541 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
H0541 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0112 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0768 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |