FL S0358 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring law enforcement agencies to provide specified veterinary services, including cremation services, for police dogs that have retired from the agency's service, etc.
Title
Police Dogs
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 34 | |
2011-10-18 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Regulated Industries; Budget -SJ 34 | |
2011-09-28 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/358 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0358/BillText/Filed/HTML |