FL S0390 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing specified personnel of hospitals, nursing homes, and home health agencies, respectively, to withhold or withdraw cardiopulmonary resuscitation if presented with a patient-directed doctor's order (PDDO) form that contains an order not to resuscitate; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to adopt by rule procedures for the implementation of PDDO forms in hospice care; requiring the Department of Health to establish by rule circumstances and procedures under which emergency medical technicians and paramedics may honor PDDO forms, etc.
Title
Patient-directed Doctor's Orders
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S392 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
H219 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
H221 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
H219 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
H221 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 1041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 6095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/390 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/390/BillText/Filed/HTML |