FL S0404 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising examination requirements for professional geologists; providing requirements for registration as a geologist-in-training; requiring geologist-in-training applicants to successfully complete the fundamentals of geology portion of the licensure examination; requiring the department to register each person as a geologist-in-training whom the board certifies has successfully completed the fundamentals portion of the geology examination, etc.
Title
Professional Geology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#512 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-73 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-03-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-26 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 223 |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-24 | House | Received |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-03-20 | House | In Messages |
2014-03-18 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/16/14, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Rules |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0223 (Similar To) 2014-03-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 404 (Ch. 2014-73)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
492 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 1051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |